EP3817653 - PERFORMING TRANS-ABDOMINAL FETAL OXYMETRY USING OPTICAL TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raydiant Oximetry, Inc. 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAY, Neil Padharia 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 02 /
ROSEN, Mark Andrew 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 03 /
JACOBS, Adam 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 04 /
ZARINS, Denise 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 05 /
HOLT, Kenneth 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 06 /
KAINERSTORFER, Jana M. 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 07 /
BOAS, David 2603 Camino Ramon Bishop Ranch 3, Suite 413 San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19831549.1 | 03.07.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US40639 | Priority number, date | US201862694122P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694122 P | US201862694130P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694130 P | US201862694135P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694135 P | US201862694146P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694146 P | US201862694170P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694170 P | US201862694199P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694199 P | US201862694261P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694261 P | US201862694184P | 05.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862694184 P | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010276 | Date: | 09.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817653 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/02, A61B5/024, A61B5/1455, A61B5/1464, A61B5/1482, A61B8/08 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B5/02411 (EP,US);
A61B5/1464 (EP,US);
A61B5/14551 (EP,US);
A61B2503/02 (EP,US);
A61B8/488 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | A61B5/00, A61B5/02, A61B5/024, A61B5/1482 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNG DER TRANSABDOMINALEN FÖTALEN OXYMETRIE MITTELS OPTISCHER TOMOGRAPHIE | [2021/19] | English: | PERFORMING TRANS-ABDOMINAL FETAL OXYMETRY USING OPTICAL TOMOGRAPHY | [2021/19] | French: | RÉALISATION D'UNE OXYMÉTRIE FOETALE TRANS-ABDOMINALE À L'AIDE D'UNE TOMOGRAPHIE OPTIQUE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.09.2024 | 06.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0154573 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [XA]US6690958 (WALKER STEPHEN D [US], et al); | [XA]US8126524 (BALBERG MICHAL [IL], et al); | [A]US9757058 (RAY NEIL PADHARIA [US]) | International search | [Y]US6690958 (WALKER STEPHEN D [US], et al); | [A]US8644900 (BALBERG MICHAL [IL], et al); | [XY]US2018070871 (RAY NEIL PADHARIA [US]) | by applicant | WO0154573 | US6690958 | US8126524 | US9757058 |