EP3876927 - STRIGOLACTONES FOR USE IN PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING INFECTIONS CAUSED BY VIRUSES OF THE HERPESVIRIDAE FAMILY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Università degli Studi di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states Universita' Degli Studi di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDOLFO, Santo c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 02 /
DE ANDREA, Marco c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 03 /
DELL'OSTE, Valentina c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 04 /
BIOLATTI, Matteo c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 05 /
PRANDI, Cristina c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 06 /
BLANGETTI, Marco c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 07 /
ARTUSO, Emma c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | 08 /
LOMBARDI, Chiara c/o Università Degli Studi Di Torino Via Verdi, 8 10124 Torino / IT | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Bosia, Alessandra, et al STUDIO TORTA S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19831876.8 | 08.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019IB59611 | Priority number, date | IT20180010142 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: IT201800010142 | [2021/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020095260 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876927 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/403, A61K31/724, A61P31/22 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/403 (EP);
A61K31/724 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/403, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/724, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | STRIGOLACTONE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER VORBEUGUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON DURCH VIREN DER HERPESVIRIDAE-FAMILIE VERURSACHTEN INFEKTIONEN | [2021/37] | English: | STRIGOLACTONES FOR USE IN PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING INFECTIONS CAUSED BY VIRUSES OF THE HERPESVIRIDAE FAMILY | [2021/37] | French: | STRIGOLACTONES DESTINÉES À ÊTRE UTILISÉES DANS LA PRÉVENTION ET/OU LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS CAUSÉES PAR DES VIRUS DE LA FAMILLE DES HERPESVIRIDAE | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 24.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009023059 (UNIV PRINCETON [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1; compound III * * claim 35 *; | [A]WO2010125065 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 39, lines 28-40 ** claims 1, 8 *; | [AD]WO2013042124 (ISRAEL STATE [IL], et al) [AD] 1-10 * page 4, lines 26-29 * * page 9, lines 6-7 * * claims 1, 2, 5, 12, 16, 17 * |