EP3897949 - UREA GRANULATION DEVICE AND METHOD CARRIED OUT IN THE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/43] | UREA GRANULATION DEVICE | ||
[2022/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stamicarbon B.V. Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMONS, Petrus Anna Maria Robertus c/o Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL | 02 /
KURSTEN, Johannes Lambertus c/o Mercator 3 6135 KW Sittard / NL | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19831930.3 | 18.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019NL50848 | Priority number, date | EP20180213505 | 18.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18213505 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020130814 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897949 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3897949 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/16, C05C9/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
B01J2/16 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (US);
B01J8/1827 (US);
B01J8/245 (US);
B05B7/0458 (US);
B05B7/0475 (US);
B05B7/10 (US);
C05C9/005 (EP,US);
C05G5/12 (US);
C07C273/02 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARNSTOFFGRANULATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND EIN IN DER VORRICHTUNG DURCHGEFÜHRTES VERFAHREN | [2022/31] | English: | UREA GRANULATION DEVICE AND METHOD CARRIED OUT IN THE DEVICE | [2022/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GRANULATION D'URÉE ET PROCEDE EFFECTUE DANS LE DISPOSITIF | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/43] | HARNSTOFFGRANULATIONSVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/43] | UREA GRANULATION DEVICE | ||
Former [2021/43] | DISPOSITIF DE GRANULATION D'URÉE | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 16.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2019 | AL | 07.12.2022 | CY | 07.12.2022 | CZ | 07.12.2022 | EE | 07.12.2022 | FI | 07.12.2022 | LT | 07.12.2022 | LV | 07.12.2022 | MC | 07.12.2022 | MK | 07.12.2022 | RS | 07.12.2022 | SE | 07.12.2022 | SI | 07.12.2022 | SK | 07.12.2022 | SM | 07.12.2022 | IE | 18.12.2022 | LU | 18.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | GR | 08.03.2023 | IS | 07.04.2023 | PT | 10.04.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/25] | HU | 18.12.2019 | |
AL | 07.12.2022 | ||
CY | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IE | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CY | 07.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IE | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IE | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SI | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IE | 18.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IE | 18.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IE | 18.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
MC | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
IS | 07.04.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SK | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
LU | 18.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 07.12.2022 | |
CZ | 07.12.2022 | ||
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 07.12.2022 | |
EE | 07.12.2022 | ||
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
IT | 18.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 07.12.2022 | |
FI | 07.12.2022 | ||
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
PT | 10.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
SM | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
RS | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
LV | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
GR | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 07.12.2022 | |
LT | 07.12.2022 | ||
SE | 07.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 07.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5395449 (QUADIR SAYEEDA J [CA], et al) [A] 7 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5964901 (KIDO KIMIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6203730 (HONDA TETSUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 3,4,8 *; | [A]DE10146778 (GLATT INGTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 7 * figure 5 *; | [A]US2012282361 (KOJIMA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 2,3,5 * | Examination | US2007148325 | DE10146778 | by applicant | EP2055373 | US2012282361 | - "Coming of age", Nitrogen & Methanol, (20041100), no. 272, pages 37 - 43 |