EP4081089 - MOVEMENT OF OBJECTS BY A ROBOTIC CLEANING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget Electrolux S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSBERG, Petter S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
WENNERSTRÖM, Magnus S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
LINDHE, Magnus c/o AB Electrolux S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
KANGE, Fredrik S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 19832695.1 | 23.12.2019 | [2022/44] | WO2019EP86897 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021129918 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081089 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/28 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A47L9/2826 (EP,KR);
A47L9/2852 (US);
A47L9/2805 (US);
A47L9/2847 (US);
G05D1/0246 (US);
A47L2201/04 (EP,KR,US);
A47L2201/06 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN DURCH EINE ROBOTERREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/44] | English: | MOVEMENT OF OBJECTS BY A ROBOTIC CLEANING DEVICE | [2022/44] | French: | MOUVEMENT D'OBJETS PAR UN DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE ROBOTISÉ | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 25.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2018210445 (CHOI HYUKDOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 1, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 9, column r, paragraph 154 * * page 10, column r, paragraph 165 - page 12, column r, paragraph 202 * * figures 1,2,23-35 *; | [X]US2019086921 (XIA YONGFENG [CN], et al) [X] 1-27 * page 1, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 1, column l, paragraph 5 - page 3, column l, paragraph 66 * * page 3, column l, paragraph 84 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]CN110393482 (SHENZHEN FEIKE ROBOT CO LTD) [X] 1-27* the whole document * |