EP3818297 - LIGHT EMISSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artilux Inc. 101 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NA, Yun-Chung No. 101, Sec. 2, Guangfu Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City, 300 / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Chien-Lung No.5, Ln. 217, Yongji St., Guishan Dist. Taoyuan City, 333 / TW | 03 /
LIN, Chieh-Ting 5F-2, No.6, Taiyuan 1st St. Hsinchu County Zhubei City, 302 / TW | 04 /
HSU, Yu-Yi 8F-1, No. 6, Taiyuan 1st st. Zhubei City, Hsinchu County 30288 / TW | 05 /
CHEN, Hui-Wen 5F-2, No. 6, Taiyuan 1st St. Zhubein City, 302 / TW | 06 /
CHEN, Bo-Jiun 101 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 07 /
CHUANG, Shih-Tai 101 Jefferson Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 19833226.4 | 08.07.2019 | [2021/19] | WO2019US40873 | Priority number, date | US201862695062P | 08.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862695062 P | US201862700688P | 19.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862700688 P | US201862751602P | 27.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862751602 P | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014154 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3818297 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21K9/00, H05B33/00, H05B33/08, H01L27/00, H01L27/12, H01S5/00, H01S5/02, G01S7/481, G02B6/12, G02B6/124, G02B6/35, G02B6/42 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G02B6/12004 (EP,US);
G01S7/484 (US);
G02B6/124 (EP,US);
G02B6/34 (US);
G02B6/3596 (EP);
G02B6/42 (EP,US);
H01L27/00 (EP);
H01L27/12 (EP);
H01S5/0071 (EP,US);
H01S5/0085 (US);
H01S5/3211 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/19] | F21K9/00, H05B33/00, H05B33/08, H01L27/00, H01L27/12, H01S5/00, H01S5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Title | German: | LICHTEMISSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | LIGHT EMISSION APPARATUS | [2021/19] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉMISSION DE LUMIÈRE | [2021/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/19] | 20.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/44] | Divisional application(s) | EP22172858.7 / EP4060375 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011052114 (BERNASCONI PIETRO A G [US], et al); | [XA]WO2016187566 (QUANTUM-SI INCORPORATED [US]) | International search | [A]US5673284 (CONGDON PHILIP A [US], et al); | [XYA]US7090133 (ZHU XIAOXUN [US]); | [Y]US7961301 (EARHART RONALD P [US], et al) |