EP3798608 - NORMAL INCIDENCE ELLIPSOMETER AND METHOD FOR MEASURING OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF SAMPLE BY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Standards and Science 267, Gajeong-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34113 / KR | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Yong Jai 1-506, 11-10, Daedeok-daero 590beon-gil Yuseong- Gu Daejeon 34121 / KR | 02 /
CHEGAL, Won 24, Baeul 2-ro Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34022 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Hyun Mo 115-1403, 15, Dunsan-ro Seo-Gu Daejeon 35228 / KR | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Behr, Wolfgang Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19833613.3 | 03.07.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019KR08147 | Priority number, date | KR20180081169 | 12.07.2018 Original published format: KR 20180081169 | [2021/13] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013517 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798608 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/21, G01J4/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G01N21/211 (EP,KR,US);
G01B11/272 (US);
G01J4/00 (EP,KR);
G01N21/13 (US);
G01N2021/213 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2201/0231 (US);
G01N2201/0612 (US);
G01N2201/0633 (US);
G01N2201/0636 (US);
G01N2201/0683 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | NORMAL EINFALLENDES ELLIPSOMETER UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG OPTISCHER EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER PROBE UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2021/13] | English: | NORMAL INCIDENCE ELLIPSOMETER AND METHOD FOR MEASURING OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF SAMPLE BY USING SAME | [2021/13] | French: | ELLIPSOMÈTRE À INCIDENCE NORMALE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DES PROPRIÉTÉS OPTIQUES D'UN ÉCHANTILLON À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2020 | Translation filed | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 03.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6753961 (NORTON ADAM E [US], et al) [Y] 2 * column 6, lines 7-9 *; | [Y]EP3035034 (LEIBNIZ INST FÜR ANALYTISCHE WISSENSCHAFTEN ISAS E V [DE]) [Y] 2* figure 1 *; | [Y]US2018113069 (CHO YONG JAI [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0101] , [0121] , [0123] , [0129] , [0130] , [0132] , [0139] , [0140] , [0159] * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y] - Azzam R M A, "Oblique and normal incidence photometric return path ellipsometers for isotropic and anisotropic surfaces", Jounal of Optics 9 (2), doi:10.1088/0150-536X/9/2/010, (1978), pages 131 - 134, URL: https://iopscience.iop.org/article/10.1088/0150-536X/9/2/010/pdf, (20211220), XP055874969 [Y] 1-15 * title * * abstract * * page 131, column l, line 1 - line 2 * * page 131, column r, line 7 - line 14 * * page 131, column r, line 48 - line 53 * * page 132, column r, line 12 - line 15 * * page 133, column r, line 3 - line 41 * * figures 1,2d * | International search | [A]US2007091311 (ASPNES DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-21 * See abstract, claim I and figures 2, 3. *; | [DY]US7889340 (FLOCK KLAUS [US], et al) [D] 1-21 * See abstract, column 4, line 48-column 8, line 55, claim 1 and figures 1-5. * [Y] ; | [A]KR20130019495 (KOREA RES INST OF STANDARDS [KR]) [A] 1-21* See claim 1 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]KR101590389B (KOREA RES INST OF STANDARDS [KR]) [A] 1-21 * See abstract, claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20160109786 (KOREA RES INST OF STANDARDS [KR]) [Y] 1-21 * See abstract, paragraphs [0145]-[0200], claims 1-13 and figures 1-4. * | by applicant | US7355708 | US7889340 | - R.M.A. AZZAM, "PIE: Perpendicular-Incidence Ellipsometry - Application to the Determination of the Optical Properties of Uniaxial and Biaxial Absorbing Crystals", Opt. Commun., (19760000), vol. 19, doi:10.1016/0030-4018(76)90401-6, page 122, XP024506352 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(76)90401-6 | - R.M.A. AZZAM, "NIRSE: Normal incidence Rotating-Sample Ellipsometer", Opt. Commun., (19770000), vol. 20, doi:10.1016/0030-4018(77)90215-2, page 405, XP024445667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(77)90215-2 | - Y. J. CHO, "Universal Evaluations and Expressions of Measuring Uncertainty for Optical element rotation type Spectroscopic Ellipsometers", Opt. Express, (20150000), vol. 23, page 15481 |