EP3764506 - WIRELESS CHARGING PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/02] | WIRELESS CHARGER AND CHARGING PAD | ||
[2023/37] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong province 518129 / CN | [2021/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yongfa Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Xiaowei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
QIU, Jin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
HUANG, Xueyan Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
DING, Tao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/51] |
Former [2021/02] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19833800.6 | 06.04.2019 | [2021/02] | WO2019CN81637 | Priority number, date | CN201810772593 | 13.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810772593 | [2021/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020010884 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3764506 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3764506 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J50/40, H01F38/14, H02J50/00, H01F27/28, H02J7/00 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H02J50/402 (EP);
H02J7/0042 (CN,US);
H02J7/02 (US);
H01F27/2804 (EP);
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES LADEPAD | [2023/37] | English: | WIRELESS CHARGING PAD | [2023/37] | French: | PLATEFORME DE CHARGE SANS FIL | [2023/37] |
Former [2021/02] | DRAHTLOSES LADEGERÄT UND LADEPAD | ||
Former [2021/02] | WIRELESS CHARGER AND CHARGING PAD | ||
Former [2021/02] | CHARGEUR SANS FIL ET PAVÉ DE CHARGE | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | Translation filed | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20080081480 (LS CABLE LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2008137996 (MOJO MOBILITY INC [US], et al); | [A]US2009179501 (RANDALL MITCH [US]); | [A]CN103647308 (JING TAO); | [XA]US2015015082 (KANAGAWA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]CN104617385 (TENDYRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN204794288U (J TOUCH CORP); | [XA]EP3069358 (THORATEC CORP [US]); | [A]EP3089373 (JTOUCH CORP [TW]); | [A]US2017264130 (LETHELLIER PATRICE [US]); | International search | [Y]CN103647308 (JING TAO); | [A]US2015091500 (CLAUDEPIERRE VINCENT [US]); | [Y]CN104617385 (TENDYRON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [Y]CN204794288U (J TOUCH CORP); | [PX]CN108879852 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |