Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
28.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.06.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
10.06.2022 | Change - classification | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
10.06.2022 | Change - classification | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
17.09.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
17.09.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] |
30.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.07.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.07.2021 | Change - representative | |
16.04.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
16.04.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
23.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2021 | Change - representative | |
25.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.01.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.01.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |