EP3821491 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins Enterprise LLC 301 East Market Street Indianapolis, IN 46024 / US | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Honggang 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, New York 12039 / US | 02 /
SHAPIRO, Andrew Philip 1 Research Circle Niskayuna, New York 12039 / US | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Pinnington, Giles Oliver Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Bradley, Josephine Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 19833806.3 | 08.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019US40801 | Priority number, date | US201816030908 | 10.07.2018 Original published format: US201816030908 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014121 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821491 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/04228, H01M8/04303, H01M8/04313, H01M8/04664, H01M8/0438, C01B3/34, H01M8/04014, H01M8/04089, H01M8/04746, H01M8/04955, H01M8/0612 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H01M8/04097 (EP,KR);
H01M8/04955 (EP,KR,US);
C01B3/34 (EP,US);
H01M8/04014 (EP,KR);
H01M8/04022 (KR,US);
H01M8/04089 (US);
H01M8/04303 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP);
H01M8/04425 (EP);
H01M8/04432 (EP);
H01M8/04686 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04738 (KR);
H01M8/04783 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/0618 (EP,KR,US);
C01B2203/0205 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/20] | H01M8/04, H01M8/04228, H01M8/04303, H01M8/04313, H01M8/04664 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/20] | English: | FUEL CELL SYSTEM AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2021/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003134164 (REISER CARL A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0027] - [0028]; figure 1 *[A] 4-15; | [XAI]US2007031718 (FUJIMURA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * paragraphs [0037] , [0 39] - [0041] - [0 43] , [0 44] , [0 50] , [0 51]; figure 3 * [A] 11-15 [I] 7,8,10; | [XA]US2009208789 (JANARTHANAM SURIYAPRAKASH AYYANGAR [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0007]; figure 1 * [A] 4-15; | [XA]US2011053013 (BAUR THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 23] , [0 25] , [0 31]; figure 1 * [A] 4-15 | International search | [A]US2006286420 (KOYAMA TAKATSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 14-20 * entire document, especially para [0038-0039] *; | [A]US2009014149 (NOH YONG GYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-13 * entire document, especially para [0008], [0055] *; | [A]US2009181270 (KAMARA JIM [DE]) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US2015357663 (RAMASWAMY SITARAM [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document, especially Abstract; para [0023-0024], [0028], [0026] *; | [A]US2017346118 (WANG HONGGANG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |