EP3817461 - POWER ADJUSTMENT METHOD, TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yun Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SONG, Jinlei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
PENG, Bingguang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
DING, Zhiming Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19834452.5 | 09.07.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019CN95258 | Priority number, date | CN201810746733 | 09.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810746733 | CN20181112580 | 31.08.2018 Original published format: CN201811012580 | [2021/18] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020011163 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3817461 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/14, H04W52/48, H04W52/36, H04W52/32, H04L1/18 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04W52/325 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP,CN);
H04W52/38 (US);
H04W52/362 (EP);
H04W52/48 (EP);
H04W52/50 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | H04W52/14, H04W52/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSANPASSUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/18] | English: | POWER ADJUSTMENT METHOD, TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE PUISSANCE, TERMINAL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2020 | Translation filed | 07.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008156321 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,15 * pages 25,26,42 *[I] 5; | [XI]US2014198736 (SHUKAIR MUTAZ ZUHIER AFIF [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,15 * paragraphs [0080] , [0112] , [ 116] , [0117] * [I] 5; | [A]WO2017191919 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-8,15 * abstract *; | [AP]US2019150096 (LEE YOUNGDAE [KR], et al) [AP] 1-8,15 * paragraphs [0110] , [ 112] - [0117] * | International search | [X]CN104838717 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-14, 32-34 * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0088] *; | [Y]CN104838717 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 15-31 * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0088] *; | [Y]CN103796320 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 15-23 * description, paragraphs [0063]-[0083] *; | [Y]CN101489257 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]) [Y] 24-31 * description, page 6, line 3 to page 9, line 6 *; | [A]CN103327596 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-34 * entire document *; | [A]CN102143568 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-34 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018106067 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-34 * entire document * | by applicant | CN20181112580 |