EP3821954 - BALL LIFTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/20] | BALL LIFTING DEVICE | ||
[2022/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cho, Byoungkoo 17, Bugu-ro Jeomdong-myeon Yeoju-si Gyeonggi-do 12667 / KR | For all designated states Jeong, Yeonuk 10-1, Yeonmujang 9-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | For all designated states Kim, Bosub 50-23, Manchon-ro Suseong-gu Daegu 42053 / KR | For all designated states Han, Changsuk 105-414, 236, Pyeongni-ro Seo-gu Daegu 41849 / KR | [2023/12] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states Cho, Byoungkoo 17, Bugu-ro Jeomdong-myeon Yeoju-si Gyeonggi-do 12667 / KR | ||
For all designated states Jeong, Yeonuk 10-1, Yeonmujang 9-gil Seongdong-gu Seoul 04782 / KR | |||
For all designated states Kim, Bosub 50-23, Manchon-ro Suseong-gu Daegu 42053 / KR | |||
For all designated states Han, Changsuk 105-414, 236, Pyeongni-ro Seo-gu Daegu 41849 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert, et al Valet Patent Services Limited Siedlungsstr. 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Sach, Greg Robert, et al Valet Patent Services LLP Siedlungsstrasse 4a 85253 Erdweg / DE | ||
Former [2021/20] | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 19835018.3 | 08.07.2019 | [2021/20] | WO2019KR08347 | Priority number, date | KR20180079225 | 09.07.2018 Original published format: KR 20180079225 | [2021/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020013546 | Date: | 16.01.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821954 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3821954 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63B47/00, B65G33/04 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A63B47/002 (EP,KR,US);
B65G33/04 (EP,KR,US);
A63B41/08 (US);
A63B71/023 (EP,US);
A63B2209/00 (EP);
A63B2225/62 (EP);
A63B2243/0037 (EP,US);
A63B2243/0095 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0214 (KR);
B65G2812/0527 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BALLHEBESYSTEM | [2022/41] | English: | BALL LIFTING SYSTEM | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LEVAGE DE BALLON | [2022/41] |
Former [2021/20] | BALLHEBEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2021/20] | BALL LIFTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2021/20] | DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE DE BALLON | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2021 | Translation filed | 22.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 21.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | IE | 08.07.2023 | LU | 08.07.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/18] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 08.07.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS508685U (NOT MENTIONED) [A] 1-5* figure - *; | [A]CN203938118U (LU YING) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [X]EP3246075 (CHO BYOUNG KOO [KR], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0126]; figures 9, 17; claim - * | International search | [A]US4970746 (BRACKMANN ROGERS F [US])[A] 1-5; | [A]JPH061418 (OHBAYASHI CORP) [A] 1-5; | [A]KR20020072149 (TOP ACE ENGINEERING CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5; | [A]KR20060015696 (KIM YOO YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-5; | [A]KR100756995B (DAE CHANG CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 | by applicant | US5076582 | KR200435097Y |