EP3897512 - WASHABLE DISPERSION OF POLYMER PARTICLES DISPERSED IN A NONAQUEOUS MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JALENQUES, Xavier L'OREAL R&I CHEVILLY 188, rue Paul Hochart BP553 94152 CHEVILLY LARUE / FR | 02 /
PORTAL, Julien L'OREAL R&I AULNAY 1, ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 AULNAY-SOUS-BOIS / FR | 03 /
TAUPIN, Simon L'OREAL R&I AULNAY 1, ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 AULNAY-SOUS-BOIS / FR | 04 /
RAMOS-STANBURY, Laure L'OREAL R&I CHEVILLY 188, rue Paul Hochart BP553 94152 CHEVILLY LARUE / FR | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | L'Oreal Service D.I.P.I. 9, rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19835648.7 | 19.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP86308 | Priority number, date | FR20180074059 | 21.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1874059 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020127733 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897512 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/04, A61K8/31, A61K8/81, A61Q15/00, A61Q19/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K8/0241 (EP);
A61K8/044 (EP);
A61K8/046 (EP);
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/8152 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61K2800/10 (EP);
A61K2800/614 (EP);
A61K2800/654 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | WASCHBARE DISPERSION VON IN EINEM NICHTWÄSSRIGEN MEDIUM DISPERGIERTEN POLYMERTEILCHEN | [2021/43] | English: | WASHABLE DISPERSION OF POLYMER PARTICLES DISPERSED IN A NONAQUEOUS MEDIUM | [2021/43] | French: | DISPERSION LAVABLE DE PARTICULES DE POLYMÈRE DISPERSÉES DANS UN MILIEU NON AQUEUX | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 21.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]FR3014875 (OREAL [FR]) [XD] 1,3-7,9-11,16 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 5 * * page 7, line 23 - page 7, line 25 * * examples 3, 4 * [I] 2,8,12-15,17; | [XI]US2016175232 (EL-KHOURI RITA JAKY [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,16 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0060] * * examples 3, 4 * [I] 2,8,12-15,17; | [XI]FR3030260 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,16 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 22 * * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 14 * * page 12, line 23 - page 12, line 25 * * examples 3, 4 * [I] 2,8,12-15,17; | [XI]FR3030268 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,9-11,16 * page 1, line 28 - page 1, line 32 * * page 9, line 23 - page 9, line 25 * * example 4 * [I] 2,8,12-15,17; | [AD]WO2017017222 (OREAL [FR]) [AD] 1-17* the whole document * | by applicant | US5002698 | EP0749747 | WO2008155059 | WO2010046229 | WO2015091513 | WO2017017222 |