EP3898773 - CATALYTIC COMPOSITIONS AND THIOLENE-BASED COMPOSITIONS WITH EXTENDED POT LIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORAVEK, Scott J. 206 Ledge Rock Lane Mars, Pennsylvania 16046 / US | 02 /
SCHWARTZMILLER, Davina J. 150 Fawn Road Rural Valley, Pennsylvania 16249 / US | 03 /
GIANELLINI, Stefano Via Dei Mille 24/A 20010 Cornaredo / IT | 04 /
BERTOLI, Matteo Via Garibaldi 7 22070 Casnate Con Bernate / IT | 05 /
BALLARINO, Maurizio Piazza San Giuseppe 3 20162 Milano / IT | 06 /
BOWLES, Steven 607 Glengary Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15215 / US | 07 /
POWELL, Adam Bradley 196 Wheatland Road Wexford, Pennsylvania 15090 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19835765.9 | 17.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019IB60881 | Priority number, date | US201816228043 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: US201816228043 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020128806 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898773 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G75/045 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C08G75/045 (EP);
B01J31/28 (US);
C08L33/08 (US);
C08L33/10 (US);
C08L35/02 (US);
C08L67/06 (US);
C08L69/00 (US);
C08L75/14 (US);
C09D175/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | KATALYTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF THIOLENBASIS MIT VERLÄNGERTER TOPFZEIT | [2021/43] | English: | CATALYTIC COMPOSITIONS AND THIOLENE-BASED COMPOSITIONS WITH EXTENDED POT LIFE | [2021/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CATALYTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE THIOLÈNE À VIE EN POT PROLONGÉE | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3676283 (KEHR CLIFTON L, et al); | [XA]WO8802879 (LOCTITE CORP [US]); | [X]US4808638 (STEINKRAUS WALTER J [US], et al) | by applicant | US4366307 | US4609762 | US4623711 | US5225472 | US6172179 | US2006270796 | US2010010133 | US2012040130 | US2012234205 | US2012238707 | US2013210986 | US2013343371 | US2013345389 | US2013345371 | US2014186543 | US2014275474 | US2014378649 | US2014378650 | US2015099858 | US2015119549 | US2015252233 | US2015252232 |