EP3886908 - PREPARATION COMPRISING A DISPERSION OF PHOSPHOLIPIDS AND FATTY ACID SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHILLING, Martin Lipschitzstraße 40 53121 Bonn / DE | 02 /
GOMEZ, Mario Goldparmänenweg 8 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
SPECKMANN, Bodo Brombeerweg 8 63796 Kahl / DE | 04 /
BENEDIKT, Anne Ginnheimer Hohl 18 60431 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
KESSLER, Christian Kerschensteinerstr. 22 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 06 /
WINDHAB, Norbert Ubierstraße 20 65719 Hofheim / DE | 07 /
OCHROMBEL, Ines Bersonstr. 15 45141 Essen / DE | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19836474.7 | 28.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019EP82919 | Priority number, date | EP20180209472 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18209472 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020109472 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3886908 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/18, A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K31/202 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
A61K9/1617 (EP,KR);
C12N5/00 (KR);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A23K20/105 (KR);
A23K20/158 (US);
A23L29/04 (KR);
A23L33/12 (US);
A61K47/183 (EP);
A61K47/24 (KR);
A61K9/127 (KR);
A61K9/1277 (US);
A61K9/145 (EP);
C12N5/0652 (US);
C12N5/0662 (KR);
C12N2500/30 (US);
C12N2500/36 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Title | German: | PRÄPARAT MIT EINER DISPERSION VON PHOSPHOLIPIDEN UND FETTSÄURESALZEN | [2021/40] | English: | PREPARATION COMPRISING A DISPERSION OF PHOSPHOLIPIDS AND FATTY ACID SALTS | [2021/40] | French: | PRÉPARATION COMPRENANT UNE DISPERSION DE PHOSPHOLIPIDES ET DE SELS D'ACIDE GRAS | [2021/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 12.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5750572 (BRUZZESE TIBERIO [IT]); | [Y]US2007042008 (KANE EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]WO2011137160 (US NUTRACEUTICALS LLC DBA VALENSA INT [US]); | [YD]WO2016102323 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2010103402 | WO2016102323 |