EP3878160 - LAYER FOUR OPTIMIZATION IN A VIRTUAL NETWORK DEFINED OVER PUBLIC CLOUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VMware LLC 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2021/37] | For all designated states VMware, Inc. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKUZE, Alex Bialik 134, ap 33 5252328 Ramat Gan / IL | 02 /
DAR, Chen 4 Rotem Street 5691000 Magshimim / IL | 03 /
BERGMAN, Aran 44A Keren Kayemet LeIsrael 5339513 Givatayim / IL | 04 /
CIDON, Israel 3041 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 05 /
VENUGOPAL, Prashanth 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | 06 /
ZOHAR, Eyal P.O. Box 345 17906 Shimshit / IL | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19836635.3 | 01.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019US59563 | Priority number, date | US201816192783 | 15.11.2018 Original published format: US201816192783 | US201816192774 | 15.11.2018 Original published format: US201816192774 | US201816192780 | 15.11.2018 Original published format: US201816192780 | US201916252696 | 20.01.2019 Original published format: US201916252696 | US201916405986 | 07.05.2019 Original published format: US201916405986 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101922 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3878160 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/10, H04L41/0806, H04L43/08, H04L45/302, H04L45/64, H04L43/20 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04L67/10 (EP);
H04L43/20 (EP);
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04L45/64 (EP);
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04L43/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/37] | H04L29/08, H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04L12/721 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | SCHICHT-VIER-OPTIMIERUNG IN EINEM VIRTUELLEN NETZWERK DEFINIERT ÜBER EINE ÖFFENTLICHE CLOUD | [2021/37] | English: | LAYER FOUR OPTIMIZATION IN A VIRTUAL NETWORK DEFINED OVER PUBLIC CLOUD | [2021/37] | French: | COUCHE POUR L'OPTIMISATION DANS UN RÉSEAU VIRTUEL DÉFINI SUR UN NUAGE PUBLIC | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 07.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2014112171 (PASDAR BABAK [US]); | [X]US2015052247 (THREEFOOT MATTHEW JOHN [US], et al) |