EP3823548 - ABLATION LESION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University Of Sydney Parramatta Road The University of Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | For all designated states Western Sydney Local Health District Hawkesbury Road Westmead NSW 2145 / AU | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAN, Pierre c/- Parramatta Road The University of Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | 02 /
BARRY, Michael Anthony c/- Hawkesbury Road Westmead, New South Wales 2145 / AU | [2024/37] |
Former [2021/21] | 01 /
QIAN, Pierre c/- Parramatta Road The University of Sydney New South Wales 2006 / AU | ||
02 /
BARRY, Michael Anthony c/- Hawkesbury Road Westmead New South Wales 2145 / AU | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19837309.4 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019AU50754 | Priority number, date | AU20180902618 | 19.07.2018 Original published format: AU 2018902618 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014746 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3823548 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18, A61N5/02 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
A61B18/1815 (EP,AU,US);
A61N5/022 (AU);
A61B5/318 (EP,US);
A61B5/346 (AU);
A61B2018/00029 (EP);
A61B2018/00077 (US);
A61B2018/00083 (US);
A61B2018/00178 (US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,AU);
A61B2018/00357 (US);
A61B2018/00363 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,AU,US);
A61B2018/00744 (US);
A61B2018/00773 (US);
A61B2018/00821 (EP);
A61B2018/00839 (EP);
A61B2018/1823 (US);
A61B2018/183 (US);
A61B2018/1853 (EP);
A61B2018/1861 (EP,AU,US);
A61B2018/1892 (AU);
A61B2218/002 (EP,AU);
A61B5/01 (EP,AU);
A61B5/68 (EP,AU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | ABLATIONSLÄSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/21] | English: | ABLATION LESION DEVICE | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION FORMANT LÉSION | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005267463 (VANNEY GUY P [US]); | [A]US2010262137 (NYE NEIL [US], et al); | [A]US2016184008 (PAPAIOANNOU ATHANASSIOS [US], et al); | [I]US2016262777 (STIGALL JEREMY [US], et al); | [A]WO2017056056 (PASQUINO ENRICO [CH], et al) | International search | [X]WO9849957 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [X]WO0035363 (ORMSBY THEODORE C [US], et al); | [X]EP2460486 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]); | [X]US2014046174 (LADTKOW CASEY M [US], et al); | [X]WO2018023132 (AXON THEREPIES INC [US]) |