EP3766856 - PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC, CERAMIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANAMORI, Yuki c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 19837312.8 | 03.07.2019 | [2021/03] | WO2019JP26405 | Priority number, date | JP20180134499 | 17.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018134499 | [2021/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020017325 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766856 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/493, C04B35/499, C04B35/491, C04B35/626, C04B35/638, C04B35/64, C01G45/00, H01L41/187, H01L41/43, // H01L41/083, H01L41/107 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
C04B35/499 (EP);
C04B35/491 (EP,CN,US);
H10N30/8536 (US);
C01G45/006 (EP);
C04B35/493 (EP);
C04B35/62605 (CN);
C04B35/6262 (EP);
C04B35/62645 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C04B35/64 (EP,CN);
H10N30/093 (CN);
H10N30/097 (EP,US);
H10N30/8554 (EP,CN);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/64 (EP);
C04B2235/3248 (EP);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/3262 (EP);
C04B2235/3296 (CN);
C04B2235/442 (CN);
C04B2235/6562 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/6565 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/658 (EP);
C04B2235/6582 (EP);
C04B2235/6584 (EP,CN);
C04B2235/6585 (EP);
C04B2235/76 (EP);
C04B2235/761 (EP);
C04B2235/768 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | C04B35/491, C01G33/00, H01L41/187 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE KERAMIK, KERAMISCHES ELEKTRONISCHES BAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR PIEZOELEKTRISCHE KERAMIK | [2021/03] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC, CERAMIC ELECTRONIC COMPONENT, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PIEZOELECTRIC CERAMIC | [2021/03] | French: | CÉRAMIQUE PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE, COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE CÉRAMIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CÉRAMIQUE PIÉZOÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2020 | Translation filed | 13.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 17.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20060022949 (UNIV CHUNGJU NAT IND ACAD COOP [KR], et al); | [XI]US2009065731 (TERANISHI KEISUKE [JP], et al); | [X]JP2010215418 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [XYI]JP2010258199 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | [XY]JP5392603B ; | [XI]EP3125317 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]); | International search | [A]JPH07267733 (DAISHINKU CORP); | [X]KR20060022949 (UNIV CHUNGJU NAT IND ACAD COOP [KR], et al); | [A]WO2006129434 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al); | [XY]JP2010215418 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [XY]JP2010258199 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | [A]WO2015147259 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2006199524 | JP2017165618 |