EP3826083 - RECHARGEABLE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR WELDING RECHARGEABLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Junil 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jinnam 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 03 /
OH, Yongseok 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sunghyun 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Sunghoon 150-20 Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19837334.2 | 08.03.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019KR02734 | Priority number, date | KR20180083637 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: KR 20180083637 | [2021/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020017727 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826083 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3826083 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/24, B23K101/36, H01M50/169 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H01M50/103 (EP,US);
H01M50/169 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0608 (EP,US);
B23K26/206 (EP,US);
B23K26/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/147 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/15 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/609 (EP,US);
B23K2101/36 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | H01M2/04, B23K26/24, B23K101/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKKU UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHWEISSEN EINES AKKUS | [2021/21] | English: | RECHARGEABLE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR WELDING RECHARGEABLE BATTERY | [2021/21] | French: | BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE DE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | Translation filed | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 16.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 24.01.2024 | ES | 24.01.2024 | FI | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | LT | 24.01.2024 | LV | 24.01.2024 | NL | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | PT | 24.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
ES | 24.01.2024 | ||
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 24.01.2024 | |
FI | 24.01.2024 | ||
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
LT | 24.01.2024 | ||
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 24.01.2024 | |
NL | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 24.01.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 24.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2859986 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2015114445 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE102015106786 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE102016110488 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP3308202 (CORELASE OY [FI]) | International search | [A]JP2007157519 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2015163412 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]WO2016198724 (CORELASE OY [FI]); | [A]KR20160146548 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]KR20170031619 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |