24.04.2024 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
19.04.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
15.04.2024 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
11.04.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.11.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.11.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
03.11.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
03.11.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
20.10.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
20.10.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] |
14.06.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
27.07.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.06.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.04.2022 |
First examination report |
|
24.09.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
16.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.05.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
21.11.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
20.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
20.11.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
07.08.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
07.08.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
02.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.06.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
05.06.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.03.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|