EP3824545 - A DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYFORD, Jamie c/- Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | 02 /
ROSENBERG, Victor c/- Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | 03 /
HARMER, Kim c/- Clearvue Technologies Ltd 16 Ord Street West Perth, Western Australia 6005 / AU | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19838046.1 | 27.06.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019AU50678 | Priority number, date | AU20180902635 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: AU 2018902635 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020014733 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824545 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02S40/36, H01R35/04, H01R12/72 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
H01L31/0508 (EP);
H02S20/30 (AU);
H02S40/36 (EP,US);
E06B7/28 (US);
E06B9/24 (EP);
H01R13/436 (AU);
H01R13/6215 (US);
H01R13/627 (AU,US);
H01R31/06 (US);
H01R35/04 (EP,US);
H02S20/22 (EP,US);
E06B2009/2476 (EP);
E06B3/6715 (EP);
H01R13/629 (AU);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRIZITÄT | [2021/21] | English: | A DEVICE FOR GENERATING ELECTRICITY | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 08.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007184682 (GOBRON STEPHANE [US]) [Y] 4-7* paragraph [0061]; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]US2010180887 (DZIADIK PAUL C [US]) [X] 1,12-15 * column 21 - column 25; figures 1-4b * [Y] 2-11; | [Y]US2011011642 (SOLON DEAN [US]) [Y] 2,3,8-11 * paragraph [0026]; figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]US4657320 (BAMFORD WILLIAM C [JP], et al) [Y] 1-25 * Abstract, Figs. 1, 4a - 4c, Col 3 lines 33-48 *; | [Y]US7553166 (GOBRON STEPHANE [US]) [Y] 1-25 * Abstract, Figs. 2, 12A, 12B, Col 6 line 66 - Col 7 lines 6, Col 7 lines 51 - 56 *; | [Y]WO2015024046 (TROPIGLAS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-25* Title, Abstract, Fig. 1, Page 7 line 34, Page 9 lines 9 - 13, Page 11 lines 1 - 2 * |