Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
06.03.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.03.2024 | First examination report | |
21.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
24.09.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
04.08.2021 | Supplementary search report | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
30.07.2021 | Change - classification | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
30.07.2021 | Change - classification | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
21.07.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.06.2021 | Change - applicant | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] |
23.04.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
23.04.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
30.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.01.2021 | Change - representative | |
08.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |