EP3824387 - QUANTUM HYBRID COMPUTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IonQ, Inc. 4505 Campus Dr. College Park, MD 20740 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCORE, Andrew Maps 4800 Auburn Avenue, Apt. 313 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
KEESAN, Matthew 1736 Irving Street, NW Washington, DC 20011 / US | 03 /
NAM, Yunseong 5822 Inman Park Circle, Unit 100 North Bethesda, MD 20852 / US | 04 /
SHEHAB, Omar 7008 Taylor Terrace Hyattsville, MD 20784 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 19838764.9 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/21] | WO2019US42344 | Priority number, date | US201816038484 | 18.07.2018 Original published format: US201816038484 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020018752 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3824387 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N10/80 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G06N10/80 (EP);
G06N10/00 (US);
G06F11/3003 (US);
G06F15/80 (US);
G06F9/4843 (US);
G06F9/5044 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | G06F9/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/21] | Title | German: | QUANTEN-HYBRIDBERECHNUNG | [2021/21] | English: | QUANTUM HYBRID COMPUTATION | [2021/21] | French: | CALCUL HYBRIDE QUANTIQUE | [2021/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/21] | 04.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9660859 (DADASHIKELAYEH MAJID [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-12,14,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 10 - column 5, line 47 * * column 6, line 13 - column 16, line 6; figures 1-5 * [I] 3,4,8,9,13; | [I] - Sarkar Aritra, "Quantum Algorithms for pattern-matching in genomic sequences", TU Delft Repository, Delft, The Netherlands, (20180622), URL: http://resolver.tudelft.nl/uuid:4257310d-6d8b-4f5a-9fda-00cf8e081f0e, (20211025), XP055854763 [I] 1-15 * chapter 2 up to chapter 2.4; page 3 - page 16; figures 2.1-2.7 * * chapter 4; page 41 - page 73; figures 4.1-4.17 * | International search | [A]US7035906 (ELLIS III FRAMPTON E [US]) [A] 1-18 and 20-25* , entire document *; | [A]US2009027402 (BAKALASH REUVEN [IL], et al) [A] 1-18 and 20-25 * , entire document *; | [A]US2009199167 (VORBACH MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 and 20-25 * , entire document *; | [X]US2011231510 (KORSUNSKY YEVGENY [US], et al) [X] 1-18 and 20-25 * , entire document, especially Fig. 2, 3, 4, 5, 24; para [0037], [0054], [0154], [0160], [0168], [0169], [0175], [0187], [0208], [0223], [0263], [0382], [0432], [0470], [0628], [0649], [0651], [0652], [0664] * | by applicant | US9660859 |