EP3836949 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SEL1-DERIVED PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF TREATMENT/PREVENTION OF EXCESS OXALATE LEVELS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS/DISEASES THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5801 South Ellis Avenue Chicago Illinois 60637 / US | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSAN, Hatim A. c/o The University of Chicago 5801 S. Ellis Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60637 / US | 02 /
ARVANS, Donna c/o The University of Chicago 5801 S. Ellis Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60637 / US | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19838795.3 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/25] | WO2019US42416 | Priority number, date | US201862699975P | 18.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862699975 P | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020018799 | Date: | 23.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3836949 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/16, A61K39/02, C07K14/47 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61K38/164 (US);
A61P13/04 (US);
A61P7/08 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/25] | A61K38/00, A61K38/16, A61K39/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT SEL1-ABGELEITETEN PEPTIDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG/PRÄVENTION VON ZU HOHEN OXALATSPIEGELN UND DAMIT EINHERGEHENDEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SEL1-DERIVED PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF TREATMENT/PREVENTION OF EXCESS OXALATE LEVELS AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS/DISEASES THEREWITH | [2021/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES PEPTIDES DÉRIVÉS DE SEL1 ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT/PRÉVENTION DE TAUX D'OXALATE EN EXCÈS ET PATHOLOGIES/MALADIES ASSOCIÉS À CEUX-CI | [2021/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 05.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6200562 (ALLISON MILTON J [US], et al); | [I]WO2005097176 (UNIV FLORIDA [US], et al); | [I]US2014030324 (SIDHU HARMEET [US], et al); | [I]EP3016669 (OXTHERA INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY AB [SE]); | [XP]WO2018136779 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]); | International search | [Y]US2012308600 (COSTANTINO PAOLO [IT], et al); | by applicant | US5359030 | US5681811 | US6200562 | US6552167 | WO2005097176 | US2014030324 | WO2015002604 | EP3016669 | WO2018136779 | WO2018US14494 |