Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11918846 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2022016474 | 20.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201819966 | 07.12.2018 | WO2019GB53415 | 03.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3890847 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201819966 | 07.12.2018 | WO2019GB53415 | 03.12.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2592326 | 23.03.2022 | B | GB2592326 | 25.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201819966 | 07.12.2018 | GB202106519 | 07.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020115470 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201819966 | 07.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2579624 | 23.06.2021 | B | GB2579624 | 01.07.2020 | A | GB201819966D0 | 23.01.2019 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201819966 | 07.12.2018 |