EP3902740 - MOTORCYCLE WITH QUADRILATERAL REAR SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/44] | MOTORCYCLE WITH QUADRILATERAL SUSPENSION WITH ADJUSTABLE GEOMETRY | ||
[2023/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piaggio & C. SpA Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera / IT | [2021/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAFFAELLI, Andrea c/o PIAGGIO & C. S.P.A Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera / IT | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
RAFFAELLI, Andrea 56025 Pontedera / IT | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19839157.5 | 24.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019IB61327 | Priority number, date | IT20180021373 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: IT201800021373 | [2021/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020136577 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902740 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3902740 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62K25/28 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
B62K25/283 (EP);
B62K25/26 (EP);
B62M17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORRAD MIT VIERARMIGER HINTERRAD AUFHÄNGUNG | [2023/23] | English: | MOTORCYCLE WITH QUADRILATERAL REAR SUSPENSION | [2023/23] | French: | MOTOCYCLE AVEC SUSPENSION ARRIÈRE À QUATRE BRAS | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/44] | MOTORRAD MIT VIERECKIGER AUFHÄNGUNG MIT EINSTELLBARER GEOMETRIE | ||
Former [2021/44] | MOTORCYCLE WITH QUADRILATERAL SUSPENSION WITH ADJUSTABLE GEOMETRY | ||
Former [2021/44] | MOTOCYCLETTE À SUSPENSION QUADRILATÉRALE À GÉOMÉTRIE RÉGLABLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 23.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5011459 (VAN DE VEL ALFONS [BE]) [X] 1,3,4,10,11 * abstract * [I] 15; | [A]US2011315468 (SELLARS DANIEL THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |