06.09.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.09.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] |
25.09.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.09.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.05.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.05.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
05.05.2023 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
05.05.2023 |
Change - French title |
published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] |
14.11.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.03.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.04.2022 [2022/14] |
04.02.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
01.10.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.10.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
07.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
23.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
16.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|