Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3902740 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | C0 | EP3902740 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2023 | B1 | EP3902740 | 03.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800021373 | 28.12.2018 | WO2019IB61327 | 24.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020136577 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800021373 | 28.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT201800021373 | 28.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT201800021373 | 28.12.2018 |