EP3902740 - MOTORCYCLE WITH QUADRILATERAL REAR SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 01.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Piaggio & C. SpA Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera / IT | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAFFAELLI, Andrea c/o PIAGGIO & C. S.P.A Viale Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera / IT | [2023/44] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
RAFFAELLI, Andrea 56025 Pontedera / IT | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 19839157.5 | 24.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019IB61327 | Procedural language | EN | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 30.11.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/01] | 07.12.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/02] | 07.12.2023 | Date of registration [2024/02] | 01.11.2023 | Date of legal effect [2024/02] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 07.12.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/02] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3902740 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 05 |