EP3902882 - HOT MELT PROCESSABLE (METH)ACRYLATE-BASED MEDICAL ADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solventum Intellectual Properties Company 3M Center, 275-6E-21 2510 Conway Ave E Maplewood, MN 55144 / US | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Junkang J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
TOURIS, Athanasios 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
SHIJING, Cheng 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
XIA, Wengsheng 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Ying 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
LIU, Junkang J. Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
TOURIS, Athanasios Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
03 /
SHIJING, Cheng Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
04 /
XIA, Wengsheng Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | |||
05 /
ZHANG, Ying Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19839679.8 | 23.12.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019IB61291 | Priority number, date | US201862785319P | 27.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862785319 P | [2021/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020136555 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902882 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/38, A61F13/00 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
C09J7/385 (EP,US);
A61F13/0253 (EP);
A61L26/0014 (US);
A61L26/0061 (US);
C09J7/35 (US);
C09J2301/414 (EP);
C09J2301/416 (US);
C09J2401/006 (US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,US);
C09J2475/006 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | HEISSSCHMELZVERARBEITBARE (METH)ACRYLATBASIERTE MEDIZINISCHE KLEBSTOFFE | [2021/44] | English: | HOT MELT PROCESSABLE (METH)ACRYLATE-BASED MEDICAL ADHESIVES | [2021/44] | French: | ADHÉSIFS MÉDICAUX À BASE DE (MÉTH)ACRYLATE POUVANT ÊTRE TRAITÉS À CHAUD | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 22.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0608891 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8-11 * claims 1-18 * * page 5 *; | [X]EP2920264 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-21 * paragraphs [0004] , [0041] , [0043] , [0078] - [0081] * * paragraphs [0090] , [0091] , [0098] , [0115] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0125]; example B6; table 1 *; | [I]WO2016167924 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [I] 1-21 * claims 1-15 ** paragraphs [0035] , [0040] , [0042] , [0045] , [0071] , [00106] *; | [X]WO2018017560 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,3,6,8-12 * page 5, lines 1-2 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 5 * * page 20, lines 13-26 * * Embodiments 1,9,11,48,54-58 * * examples 2,3 * * claims 1-25 * | by applicant | US3645835 | US4595001 | US4737559 | US4838253 | US5088483 | US5160315 | US5804610 | US5886122 | US5891076 | US6051747 | US6294249 | US2010331785 | US2011212325 | JP4849200B |