EP3829095 - RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO., LTD. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Yumin 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
MA, Yue 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19840559.9 | 17.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019CN96328 | Priority number, date | CN201810837103 | 26.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810837103 | [2021/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020030 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829095 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04W74/00, H04W74/08 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
H04L1/1819 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W74/004 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP);
H04L5/00 (KR);
H04W74/006 (CN,KR);
H04L1/188 (EP);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/22] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE | [2021/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2021 | Translation filed | 26.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 04.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2018064367 (IDAC HOLDINGS INC [US]); | International search | [X]CN108282301 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-33 * description, paragraphs [0074]-[0128] and [0169]-[0193] *; | [X]CN108282897 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-33 * description, paragraphs [0013]-[0028] *; | [X]CN108282874 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-33 * description, paragraphs [0005]-[0039] *; | [X]CN108282899 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-33 * description, paragraphs [0083]-[0118] *; | [A]WO2018130017 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-33 * entire document * |