EP3826652 - HEPATO-BILIARY-PANCREATIC TISSUES AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Children's Hospital Medical Center 3333 Burnet Avenue Cincinnati, OH 45229-3039 / US | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEBE, Takanori 634 Sycamore Street, Apartment 7G Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | 02 /
KOIKE, Hiroyuki 1-3-4-402 Kandasarugakucho Tokyo 101-0064 / JP | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19840573.0 | 16.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019US41985 | Priority number, date | US201862703559P | 26.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862703559 P | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020023245 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826652 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/407, C12M1/00, C12N5/00, C12N5/071, C12N5/073, A61K35/12, A61L27/38, A61K35/28, A61K35/39, A61K35/413, A61K35/44, A61K35/545, C12M1/42 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C12N5/0671 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0697 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0677 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K35/39 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/407 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/413 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/44 (EP,US);
A61K35/545 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (KR);
A61P1/18 (KR);
C12M35/08 (EP);
C12N5/0062 (EP);
C12N5/0679 (EP);
C12N2501/115 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/727 (EP,US);
C12N2502/14 (EP,US);
C12N2502/22 (EP,US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | A61K35/407, C12M1/00, C12N5/00, C12N5/071, C12N5/073 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | LEBER-GALLEN-PANKREAS-GEWEBE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2021/22] | English: | HEPATO-BILIARY-PANCREATIC TISSUES AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME | [2021/22] | French: | TISSUS HÉPATO-BILIO-PANCRÉATIQUES ET MÉTHODES PERMETTANT DE LES OBTENIR | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 14.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008193421 (KRUSE CHARLI [DE], et al); | [A]US2012264209 (ODORICO JON [US], et al); | [A]US2016312191 (SPENCE JASON [US], et al); | [Y]WO2017048193 (AGENCY FOR SCIENCE TECH AND RES (A*STAR) [SG]); | [A]WO2017136479 (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US]); | [A]US2017240866 (WELLS JAMES MACORMACK [US], et al); | [PA]WO2018197544 (IMBA INST MOLEKULARE BIOTECH [AT]); | [PX]WO2019074793 (CHILDRENS HOSPITAL MED CT [US]); | by applicant | US2008193421 | WO2017048193 |