EP3827382 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF CONDITION IN COMPLEX OPERATIONAL SYSTEMS BASED ON MULTI-LEVEL PATTERN RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Falkonry, Inc. 10020 N DE ANZA BLVD 200 CUPERTINO CA 95014 / US | [2023/43] |
Former [2021/22] | For all designated states Falkonry, Inc. 1309 S. Mary Ave 215 Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSEN, Gregory 10020 N De Anza Blvd 200 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
MEHTA, Nikunj 10020 N De Anza Blvd 200 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Lenin Kumar 10020 N De Anza Blvd 200 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
KEARNS, Dan 10020 N De Anza Blvd 200 Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2023/43] |
Former [2021/22] | 01 /
OLSEN, Gregory 1309 S. Mary Ave 215 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | ||
02 /
MEHTA, Nikunj 1309 S. Mary Ave 215 Sunnyvale, California 95054 / US | |||
03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Lenin Kumar 1309 S. Mary Ave 215 Sunnyvale, California 95054 / US | |||
04 /
KEARNS, Dan 1309 S. Mary Ave 215 Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19840662.1 | 30.05.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019US34628 | Priority number, date | US201816042881 | 23.07.2018 Original published format: US201816042881 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020023111 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3827382 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3827382 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3827382 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06N20/00, G06F18/2134, G06F18/2413, G06N3/044 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G05B23/0221 (EP);
G05B23/024 (EP);
G05B23/0289 (EP);
G06F18/2134 (EP);
G06F18/24133 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | G06N20/00, G06N3/04, G06V10/82, G06K9/00, G05B23/02, G06K9/62 | ||
Former IPC [2021/22] | G06N20/00, G06F17/14, G06F16/00, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSTANDSBEURTEILUNG IN KOMPLEXEN BETRIEBSSYSTEMEN BASIEREND AUF MEHRSTUFIGER MUSTERERKENNUNG | [2021/22] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF CONDITION IN COMPLEX OPERATIONAL SYSTEMS BASED ON MULTI-LEVEL PATTERN RECOGNITION | [2021/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'ÉTAT DANS DES SYSTÈMES OPÉRATIONNELS COMPLEXES SUR LA BASE D'UNE RECONNAISSANCE DE MOTIF MULTINIVEAU | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 06.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018173173 (LEONARD MICHAEL JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0033] - [0036] - [0108] , [0131] - [0177]; figures 13,14 * | International search | [A]US5440661 (PAPCUN GEORGE J [US]) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2002023116 (KIKUCHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2007292002 (KAPLAN CHRISTIANE [DE]) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2011188583 (TORAICHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* entire document *; | [A]US2012198420 (PEIN HOWARD BARRY [US]) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2017017901 (FIROOZ MOHAMMAD H [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * entire document *; | [A]US2017316067 (SUBRAMANIAN ANAND [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * entire document * |