EP3831874 - ADDITIVE COMPOSITION, POLYOLEFIN RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME, METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYOLEFIN RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADEKA CORPORATION 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo 116-8554 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA Ryo c/o ADEKA CORPORATION, 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome, Minami-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 336-0022 / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA Yuri c/o ADEKA CORPORATION, 2-13, Shirahata 5-chome, Minami-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama 336-0022 / JP | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19841759.4 | 18.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019JP28320 | Priority number, date | JP20180140920 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018140920 | [2021/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020022189 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831874 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/00, C08K5/1575, C08K5/52, C08K5/098 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
C08K5/1575 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP);
C08K5/527 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L23/12 (EP);
C08K5/1575, C08L23/12 (EP);
C08K5/527, C08L23/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | C08L23/00, C08K5/1575, C08K5/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | ADDITIVZUSAMMENSETZUNG, POLYOLEFINHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER POLYOLEFINHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMARTIKEL DARAUS | [2021/23] | English: | ADDITIVE COMPOSITION, POLYOLEFIN RESIN COMPOSITION CONTAINING SAME, METHOD FOR PRODUCING POLYOLEFIN RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED ARTICLES THEREOF | [2021/23] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ADDITIF, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYOLÉFINE LA CONTENANT, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYOLÉFINE, ET ARTICLES MOULÉS DE CELLE-CI | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2021 | Translation filed | 15.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2009120800 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [X] 1,3-8 * comparative examples 7 and 8; paragraphs [0048] , [0051]; examples 3,4; claims 1-3; table 1 *; | [I]US2011105657 (TANJI NAOKO [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5-8 * claims 1,4 *; | [XI]US2013065994 (YOKOTA AKIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * example 11; table 2 * [I] 1,2,5-8; | [A]CN105131334 (UNIV EAST CHINA SCIENCE & TECH)[A] 1-8 | International search | [X]JP2009120800 (JAPAN POLYPROPYLENE CORP) [X] 1-6 * , paragraphs [0098]-[0102], table 1, examples 3, 4 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2011246589 (ADEKA CORP) [X] 1-6 * , claims 1, 7, paragraphs [0042], [0083], [0101], [0107], [0115], [0130], table 2, example 11 & US 2013/0065994 A1, claims 1, 7, paragraphs [0054], [0084], [0099], [0102], [0110], [0126], table 2, example 11 & WO 2011/148868 A1 & EP 2578620 A1 & CN 102918091 A & KR 10-2013-0088048 A *; | [A]JP2015201616 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP) [A] 1-6* , paragraph [0025] (Family: none) * | by applicant | WO2014192813 | WO2016043172 | JP2017171884 |