Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
14.06.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
14.07.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.11.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
18.11.2022 | Change - classification | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
18.11.2022 | Change - classification | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
06.07.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.10.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
01.10.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] |
22.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.06.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.05.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
07.05.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
12.04.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.02.2021 | Change - representative | |
05.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.06.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
03.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.02.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
01.02.2020 | New entry: applicant or inventor |