Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024016798 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | US202117263723 | 27.01.2021 | US202318370069 | 19.09.2023 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11766432 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2023 | B2 | US2021186957 | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | US201917263723 | 27.07.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210053892 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021531316 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL280364 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113164453 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3107317 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019309523 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3829577 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | A4 | EP3829577 | 09.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11202100593P | 25.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2019US43820 | 27.07.2019 | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020023947 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962788790 | 05.01.2019 | US201862711427 | 27.07.2018 |