EP3828257 - DISPOSABLE BIOPROCESS BAG, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, HOT-MELT ANNULAR WELDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Jinyishengshi Bioengineering Co., Ltd. 3-1201-2 Room No.1366 Hongfeng Road Huzhou Zhejiang 313000 / CN | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Fulin 3-1201-2 Room, No.1366 Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313000 / CN | 02 /
YUAN, Shiping 3-1201-2 Room, No.1366 Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313000 / CN | 03 /
SONG, Jinpei 3-1201-2 Room, No.1366 Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313000 / CN | 04 /
HAN, Wei 3-1201-2 Room, No.1366 Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313000 / CN | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/22] | Wenzel Nemetzade Warthmüller Patentanwälte Part mbB Maximilianstraße 2 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19841876.6 | 23.07.2019 | [2021/22] | WO2019CN97183 | Priority number, date | CN201810812327 | 23.07.2018 Original published format: CN201810812327 | [2021/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020020116 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828257 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, B29C65/02, B65D25/16, B31B70/64 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
C12M23/14 (EP,US);
C12M1/00 (CN);
B29C66/8511 (US);
B29C65/02 (EP,CN);
B29C65/4815 (US);
B31B70/14 (EP,CN);
B31B70/20 (CN,US);
B31B70/64 (CN,US);
B31B70/642 (EP);
C12M1/007 (CN);
C12M23/28 (US);
B31B2150/00 (US);
B31B2150/002 (EP);
B31B2150/003 (EP);
B31B2160/20 (EP);
B31B2160/30 (EP);
B31B2241/00 (EP);
B31B70/04 (EP);
B31B70/84 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | C12M1/00, B29C65/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/22] | Title | German: | WEGWERFBARER BIOPROZESSBEUTEL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, HEISSSCHMELZRINGSCHWEISSMASCHINE | [2021/22] | English: | DISPOSABLE BIOPROCESS BAG, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR, HOT-MELT ANNULAR WELDING MACHINE | [2021/22] | French: | SAC DE BIOTRAITEMENT JETABLE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ, MACHINE DE SOUDAGE ANNULAIRE THERMOFUSIBLE | [2021/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2021 | Translation filed | 22.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/22] | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE459511 (TELLSCHOW MASCHINENFABRIK GEB); | [A]CH310306 (FELCHLIN FRIEDRICH [CH]); | [A]GB741991 (COMMUNICATIONS PATENTS LTD); | [Y]DE1098190 (WOLFF & CO KG); | [Y]DE1118960 (ANTON KOLB); | [A]DE1147025 (JOISTEN & KETTENBAUM G M B H E); | [A]DE20100136U (GUT REINHARD [CH]); | [Y]US2016159519 (CHISM RICHARD D [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018082552 (ZHEJIANG JINYISHENGSHI BIOENGINEERING CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [A]CN102152498 (YONGQI LIANG); | [Y]CN102529170 (SHUAIJUN JIA, et al); | [Y]CN102744878 (SUZHOU KEBER PREC MACHINERY CO); | [A]CN203449601U (SUZHOU KEBER PREC MACHINERY CO); | [A]CN104275537 (HONGHU BLUELIGHT ELECTRONIC CO LTD); | [Y]CN108018204 (ZHEJIANG JINYISHENGSHI BIO ENG CO LTD) |