EP3776161 - METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CONFIGURING TOUCH SCREEN KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHARDWAJ, Gaurav Kumar Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 02 /
KUMAR, Mohit Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 03 /
SPALL, Sandeep Singh Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 04 /
KUMAR, Vinay Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 05 /
SHARMA, Kaushal Prakash Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 06 /
THAKUR, Prajeet Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 07 /
DAHIYA, Pramesh Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | 08 /
DHUNNA, Vipul Krishan Samsung India Electronics Pvt. Ltd. Logix Cyber Park Plot No. C-28/29 Tower D - Ground to 10th Floor, Tower C - 7th Floor Sector 62, Noida (U.P.) 201301 / IN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19842110.9 | 12.06.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR07064 | Priority number, date | IN201841028363 | 27.07.2018 Original published format: IN201841028363 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020022645 | Date: | 30.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3776161 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3776161 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.01.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/04886, G06F3/0484, G06F3/023 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/0238 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/22] | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0484, G06F3/023 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | G06F3/0488, G06F3/023, G06F3/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURATION EINER BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRMTASTATUR | [2021/07] | English: | METHOD AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CONFIGURING TOUCH SCREEN KEYBOARD | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR CONFIGURER UN CLAVIER D'ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.01.2024 | HR | 24.01.2024 | PL | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 24.01.2024 | |
HR | 24.01.2024 | ||
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 24.01.2024 | |
NO | 24.04.2024 | ||
RS | 24.04.2024 | ||
GR | 25.04.2024 | ||
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 24.04.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 24.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2990925 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR]) | International search | [Y]US2009237359 (KIM BO-MI [KR], et al); | [YX]KR20160101633 (WIZARD WORKS [KR]); | [A]KR20170081842 (PARK CHI WON [KR]); | [Y]WO2017217762 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2018121085 (PARK SUNG WOOK [KR], et al) | by applicant | US2009237359 | EP2990925 |