EP3897421 - SCREW FIXING DEVICE, FIXING KIT AND FIXING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azurmeds Inc 2547 Farrington Street Dallas, TX 75207 / US | [2021/52] |
Former [2021/43] | For all designated states Azurmeds Inc 4809 N. Ravenswood Apt 119 Chicago IL 60640 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Jean-Marie 11345 Bluestem Lane Eden Prairie, MI 55347 / US | 02 /
DERANSART, Pierric 728 Route de la Combette 38410 Saint Martin d' Uriage / FR | 03 /
CHUINARD, Christopher R. 1416 Wayne St. Traverse City, MI 49684 / US | 04 /
BRADLEY EDWARDS, Thomas 1610 Milford St. Houston, TX 77016 / US | 05 /
GARRIGUES, Grant E. 435 N Bruner Street Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | 06 /
HATZIDAKIS, Armodios M. 239 Ash St. Denver, CO 80220 / US | 07 /
NICHOLSON, Gregory P. 4052 Grand Avenue Western Spring, IL 60558 / US | 08 /
BUDDY SAVOIE, Felix 80 Audubon Av. New Orleans, LA 70118 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Colbert Innovation Immeuble "Le Britannia", Bâtiment B, 7e étage 20 Boulevard Eugène Deruelle 69432 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19842401.2 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019IB61203 | Priority number, date | US201862783780P | 21.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862783780 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020129014 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3897421 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/86 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/1778 (EP,US);
A61B17/863 (US);
A61B17/15 (EP);
A61B17/1635 (US);
A61B17/1684 (US);
A61B17/68 (US);
A61B17/8605 (US);
A61B17/8635 (US);
A61B17/864 (US);
A61B17/8866 (EP,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61F2/30749 (US);
A61F2/40 (US);
A61F2/4601 (EP);
A61F2/4644 (EP);
A61B2017/564 (US);
A61B2017/567 (US);
A61B2017/568 (US);
A61B2017/681 (US);
A61B2034/105 (US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4627 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | SCHRAUBENBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BEFESTIGUNGSBAUSATZ UND BEFESTIGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/43] | English: | SCREW FIXING DEVICE, FIXING KIT AND FIXING METHOD | [2021/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION PAR VIS, KIT DE FIXATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 25.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010145397 (OVERES TOM [CH], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0058] - [0065]; figures 1-4D *; | [A]US2013158610 (HERNANDEZ JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figures 1A,1B,4-6 *; | [A]US2017196612 (CASTANEDA ALFREDO [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0015] - [0021]; figures 1,4-6 * | by applicant | US4175555 | US4463753 | US4537185 | US5334204 | US5403136 | US5925048 | US6306140 | US6565573 | US7637929 | US8900279 | US10130407 |