Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3897421
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.07.2024 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.02.2024 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
25.02.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] |
28.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.11.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] |
24.09.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
24.09.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
24.09.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] |
31.08.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
25.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
03.02.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|