EP4076997 - TRUCK TIRE WITH STIFF OUTER BEAD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTON, Christopher c/o Michelin North America, Inc. IP Dept. 515 Michelin Road Greenville, South Carolina 29605 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 19842467.3 | 18.12.2019 | [2022/43] | WO2019US67132 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021126187 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076997 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60C15/06, B60C15/04 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B60C15/0607 (EP,US);
B60C15/0628 (EP,US);
B60C15/04 (EP);
B60C2015/0617 (EP);
B60C2015/0621 (EP,US);
B60C2015/065 (EP,US);
B60C2200/06 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | LKW-REIFEN MIT STEIFEN ÄUSSEREN WULSTPRODUKTEN | [2022/43] | English: | TRUCK TIRE WITH STIFF OUTER BEAD PRODUCTS | [2022/43] | French: | PNEU DE CAMION AYANT DES PRODUITS DE TALON EXTERNE RIGIDES | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 31.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4227563 (GROSCH KARL, et al); | [A]WO2019002726 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]); | [A]WO2019108207 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al); | [A]WO2019231438 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) |