EP3730623 - SMALL-MOLECULE HYALURONIC ACID OR SALT THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shandong Awa Biopharm Co., Ltd. No. 488 Huanghe 12 Road Bincheng District Binzhou City, Shandong 256600 / CN | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Xiuyun No. 488 Huanghe 12 Road Bincheng District Binzhou City, Shandong 256600 / CN | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19842856.7 | 25.12.2019 | [2020/44] | WO2019CN128316 | Priority number, date | CN201910164881 | 05.03.2019 Original published format: CN201910164881 | [2020/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020177455 | Date: | 10.09.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3730623 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.09.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/26, C12P19/14, C12N9/88 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C12Y402/02001 (EP);
C12P19/14 (EP);
C12P19/26 (EP);
C12Y402/99 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | C12P19/26, C12P19/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Title | German: | KLEINMOLEKULARE HYALURONSÄURE ODER DEREN SALZE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2020/44] | English: | SMALL-MOLECULE HYALURONIC ACID OR SALT THEREOF, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2020/44] | French: | D'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE À PETITE MOLÉCULE OU SEL CORRESPONDANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2020 | Translation filed | 07.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2023 | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2818543 (BLOOMAGE FREDA BIOPHARM CO LTD [CN]) [X] 13 * page 2, paragraph [0001] * * page 3, paragraph [0015] - page 5, paragraph [0030] * * page 6, paragraph [0042]; tables 2-3 *; | [X]CN106309471 (HUI MIZHOU) [X] 13 * the whole document *; | [X]CN108220364 (BLOOMAGE FREDA BIOPHARM CO LTD, et al) [X] 13 * the whole document *; | [XP]CN110408607 (SHANDONG AWA BIOPHARM CO LTD) [XP] 1-13* the whole document * |