|
04.04.2025 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2025 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.07.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2021 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2021 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.07.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Rectified claims sheet(s) produced by ISA/EP under Rule 91 PCT |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.06.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
05.03.2020 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.03.2020 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2020 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.02.2020 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
01.02.2020 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
33 |
|
01.02.2020 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.02.2020 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
01.02.2020 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
5 |