EP3830668 - MULTI-FORM FACTOR INFORMATION HANDLING SYSTEM (IHS) WITH REMOVABLE KEYBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dell Products, L.P. One Dell Way Round Rock, TX 78682 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINN, Liam B. 8611 Camelia Lane Austin, Texas 78759 / US | 02 /
ROBINETTE, Christopher Alan 1446 Eastshore Dr. Alameda, California 94501 / US | 03 /
KNOPPPERT, Michiel Sebastiaan Emanuel Petrus JF van Hengelstraat 32 1019 DC Amsterdam / NL | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19843296.5 | 20.06.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US38174 | Priority number, date | US201816050392 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US201816050392 | US201916356920 | 18.03.2019 Original published format: US201916356920 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020027933 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830668 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F3/04886, G06F3/04883, G06F3/023 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F1/1669 (EP,US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F1/1618 (EP);
G06F1/1656 (US);
G06F1/1681 (EP,US);
G06F3/0231 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (US);
G06F3/038 (US);
G06F3/0487 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP);
G06F3/1423 (US);
G06F3/1431 (EP);
G06F2200/1632 (EP);
G06F3/017 (US);
G09G2300/023 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | G06F1/16, G06F3/023 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | MEHRFORMFAKTOR-INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM (IHS) MIT ABNEHMBARER TASTATUR | [2021/23] | English: | MULTI-FORM FACTOR INFORMATION HANDLING SYSTEM (IHS) WITH REMOVABLE KEYBOARD | [2021/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INFORMATION (IHS) À MULTIPLES FACTEURS DE FORME DOTÉ D'UN CLAVIER AMOVIBLE | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 07.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010207888 (CAMIEL NOAM [IL]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2011026210 (TRACY MARK S [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2006183505 (WILLRICH CANDACE Y [US]) [A] 1-20* , entire document. *; | [A]US2009244016 (CASPARIAN MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. * | by applicant | US2010207888 | US2011026210 |