EP3830568 - UNIVERSAL MARKER FOR WATER QUALITY ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X2O Corp. 12 e 86th Street 524 New York NY 10028-0509 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAZHIBAYEV, Alibek 445 Artisan Way , Nr 332 Somerville, MA 02145 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Somervell, Thomas Richard Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 19843651.1 | 01.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US44634 | Priority number, date | US201862714349P | 03.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862714349 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028645 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830568 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/22, G01N33/52, G01N33/543, G01N33/53, G06T7/00, G06T7/90 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
G06T7/0004 (EP);
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
G01N31/22 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP);
G01N33/543 (EP);
G06T7/90 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | G01N31/22, G01N33/52, G01N33/543 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLER MARKER ZUR BEURTEILUNG DER WASSERQUALITÄT | [2021/23] | English: | UNIVERSAL MARKER FOR WATER QUALITY ASSESSMENT | [2021/23] | French: | MARQUEUR UNIVERSEL D'ÉVALUATION DE LA QUALITÉ DE L'EAU | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 25.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/14] | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2006280933 (ETHICON INC) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0067] - [0070] * [A] 5-7,10 [Y] 8,9,12-15; | [XAY]US2009095164 (CELESTE SALVATORE ALBERT [US]) [X] 1-4,9,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0029]; example 7 * [A] 5-7,10 [Y] 8,11,14; | [XAY]US2012208222 (HECHT ANDREW MARK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0028] - [0033] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0056] - [0057] * [A] 5-7,10[Y] 8,11,14; | [IAY]CN107042469 (SAN FANG CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] * [A] 5-7,10 [Y] 8,9,12-15 | International search | [XY]US3802842 (LANGE H, et al) [X] 1-7, 18, 19 * entire document * [Y] 12, 13, 17; | [Y]US4647430 (ZWEIG STEPHEN E [US]) [Y] 13 * entire document *; | [A]US5756049 (BRAYTON SCOTT V [US]) [A] 1-19* entire document *; | [A]US2003203499 (EVTODIENKO VLADIMIR [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [A]US2009215199 (GRAHAM ANAFLOR Q [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010112680 (BROCKWELL PAUL NIGEL [AU], et al) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013213822 (DIEBOLD ERIC R [US], et al) [Y] 17 * entire document * |