EP3830756 - AUTOMATED DOCUMENT EXTRACTION AND CLASSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intuit Inc. 2700 Coast Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUTHIT, Ronnie, Douglas 5601 Headquarters Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 02 /
MOHAPATRA, Deepankar 5601 Headquarters Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 03 /
SHAMANNA, Ram, Mohan 7923 Shackelford Drive Frisco, TX 75035 / US | 04 /
REDDY, Chiranjeev, Jagannadha 5601 Headquarters Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 05 /
HUANG, Yexin 3713 Morning Dove Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | 06 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Trichur, Shivaramakrishnan 5601 Headquarters Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 07 /
DURAISAMI, Chinnadurai 8401 Memorial Lane Apt. 2208 Plano, TX 75024 / US | 08 /
PATCHIRAJAN, Karpaga, Ganesh 5601 Headquarters Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | 09 /
MATTEY, Amar, J. 5601 Headquarters Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/20] |
Former [2021/23] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19843978.8 | 24.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US43167 | Priority number, date | US201816054781 | 03.08.2018 Original published format: US201816054781 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028109 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830756 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3830756 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/10, G06N3/045, G06F16/35, G06F16/583, G06N5/04, G06V30/41 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G06Q40/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/353 (EP,US);
G06F16/5846 (EP);
G06F16/93 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N5/02 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/16] | G06K9/62, G06K9/00, G06N3/02, G06V30/41, G06F16/35, G06F16/583, G06Q40/00, G06N3/04, G06N5/04 | ||
Former IPC [2021/23] | G06K9/62, G06K9/00, G06N3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISIERTE DOKUMENTEXTRAKTION UND -KLASSIFIZIERUNG | [2021/23] | English: | AUTOMATED DOCUMENT EXTRACTION AND CLASSIFICATION | [2021/23] | French: | EXTRACTION ET CLASSIFICATION AUTOMATISÉES DE DOCUMENTS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 05.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - GALLO IGNAZIO ET AL, "Deep Neural Networks for Page Stream Segmentation and Classification", 2016 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL IMAGE COMPUTING: TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS (DICTA), IEEE, (20161130), doi:10.1109/DICTA.2016.7797031, pages 1 - 7, XP033029221 [Y] 1-15 * Title;; figure 1 * * II. Related Works; page 1, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DICTA.2016.7797031 | [Y] - NAWEI CHEN ET AL, "A survey of document image classification: problem statement, classifier architecture and performance evaluation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION., DE, (20060803), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s10032-006-0020-2, ISSN 1433-2833, pages 1 - 16, XP055766249 [Y] 1-15 * 4.1.2 Choice of document features; page 6 * * page 4, column left * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10032-006-0020-2 | [A] - Wiedemann Gregor ET AL, "Page Stream Segmentation with Convolutional Neural Nets Combining Textual and Visual Features", (20180208), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1710.03006v2.pdf, (20220309), XP055899103 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KOCHI T ET AL, "User-defined template for identifying document type and extracting information from documents", DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, 1999. ICDAR '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BANGALORE, INDIA 20-22 SEPT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990920), ISBN 978-0-7695-0318-9, pages 127 - 130, XP010351269 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - AFZAL MUHAMMAD ZESHAN ET AL, "Deepdocclassifier: Document classification with deep Convolutional Neural Network", 2015 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION (ICDAR), IEEE, (20150823), doi:10.1109/ICDAR.2015.7333933, pages 1111 - 1115, XP032814944 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.2015.7333933 | International search | [A]US2007183655 (KONIG ARND C [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See claims 1-8 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20100122298 (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR]) [A] 1-22* See claims 1-8 and figure 1. *; | [A]JP2011170786 (NOMURA RES INST LTD) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0025] and figure 1. *; | [A]US2014156567 (SCHOLTES JOHANNES CORNELIS [NL]) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0053]-[0057], claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2014279937 (MCHENRY CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See claims 15-18. *; | [A]US2017308790 (NOGUEIRA DOS SANTOS CICERO [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0040] and figures 1, 2. * | by applicant | - NAWEI CHEN et al., A survey of document image classification: problem statement, classifier architecture and performance evaluation, ISSN 1433-2833, DOI: 1O.1007/s10032-006-0020-2 |