EP3829747 - SORBENT DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calgon Carbon Corporation 3000 GSK Drive Moon Township, PA 15108 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREENBANK, Michael 5010 Park Drive Monaca, Pennsylvania 15061 / US | 02 /
VAUGHN, Robert H. 5850 Southhampton Drive Bethel Park, Pennsylvania 15102 / US | 03 /
GEBHARD, Robert 3000 GSK Drive Moon Township, Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 04 /
EVANOVICH, Steven 3000 GSK Drive Moon Township, Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 05 /
TRAMPOSCH, Walter G. 238 Glenmore Drive Moon Township, Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 06 /
DOUGHTY, David T. 1006 Whispering Woods Drive Moon Township, Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 07 /
HERRMAN, Andrew 5894 Murray Ave. Bethel Park, Pennsylvania 15102 / US | 08 /
ADOMAITIS, Matthew 3000 GSK Drive Moon Township, Pennsylvania 15108 / US | 09 /
MIMNA, Richard A. 201 Heritage Drive Oakdale, Pennsylvania 15071 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19844171.9 | 02.08.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US44958 | Priority number, date | US201862713868P | 02.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862713868 P | US201862735389P | 24.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862735389 P | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028839 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3829747 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01D53/14 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
B01J20/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/0407 (EP,KR);
B01D53/0415 (KR,US);
B01J20/28011 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/2804 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/2805 (EP,KR,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,KR);
F02M25/0854 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2253/25 (KR,US);
B01D2253/34 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SORPTIONSMITTELVORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/23] | English: | SORBENT DEVICES | [2021/23] | French: | DISPOSITIFS SORBANTS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 27.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5952420 (SENKUS RAYMOND [US], et al); | [A]US5964221 (MCKENNA DOUGLAS B [US]); | [XI]US7077891 (JAFFE STEPHEN MOSHEIM [US], et al); | [XI]US8372477 (BUELOW MARK T [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US5016628 (LAMBERT BARNUM B [US]) [Y] 5-6, 20-22 * Abstract; col 1 In 58-62; col 1 In 66-68; col 2 In 4-5; col 2 In 10-12; col 2 In 51-55; and Figure 1. *; | [Y]US5500038 (DAUBER EDWIN G [US], et al) [Y] 8-18 * Abstract, col 3 In 1-2; col 4 In 56-60; col 5 In 3-5; col 6 In 47-58; col 7 In 19-36. *; | [A]US6176897 (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA]) [A] 1-23 * Entire Document. *; | [Y]US2002170436 (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA], et al) [Y] 8-18 * Abstract, para [0012]-[0014], [0019], [0055], [0060], [0067]-[0068], [0129]-[0130], [0170], [0180], [0185]-[0186], [0188]-[0189], Figure 13A; Figure 14A; Figure 14C *; | [XY]US2004118287 (JAFFE STEPHEN MOSHEIM [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 19, 23 * Abstract, para [0012], [0028], [0039], [0042], [0044], [0049], [0051], and Figure 5. * [Y] 5-7, 20-22; | [Y]US2013269532 (KIMOTO JUNYA [JP]) [Y] 7 * Abstract, para [0016], [0028], and Figure 1. *; | [A]US2016166972 (OWENS TRACIE L [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * Entire Document. *; | [XP]US2018214816 (GREENBANK MICHAEL [US]) [XP] 1-23* Entire Document. * |