EP3831399 - ANTI-NOROVIRUS AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KJ Bio Co., Ltd. 2-2111-1, Itsuwa-machi Teno Amakusa-shi, Kumamoto 863-2424 / JP | For all designated states Chubu University Educational Foundation 1200, Matsumoto-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-8501 / JP | [2024/31] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | ||
For all designated states Chubu University Educational Foundation 1200, Matsumoto-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi 487-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASANO Mana c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 02 /
KUNO Hitoshi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 03 /
ATSUMI Kinya c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 04 /
HAYASHI Kyoko c/o CHUBU UNIVERSITY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 1200, Matsumoto-cho Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-8501 / JP | 05 /
KAWAHARA Tosihio c/o CHUBU UNIVERSITY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION 1200, Matsumoto-cho Kasugai-shi, Aichi 487-8501 / JP | 06 /
KOMATSU Satoko c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/23] | Application number, filing date | 19844221.2 | 25.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019JP29306 | Priority number, date | JP20180143050 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018143050 | [2021/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020026951 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831399 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/05, A01N43/16, A01N65/03, A01P1/00, A23K10/16, A23L33/105, A23L33/12, A61K31/7032, A61K35/68, A61K35/748, A61K36/02, A61P31/14, A23K50/40, A23K50/10 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A23K50/40 (EP);
A01N43/16 (EP);
A01N65/03 (EP);
A23K10/16 (EP);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23L33/10 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A23L33/115 (EP);
A61K31/7032 (EP);
A61K35/748 (EP);
A61K36/02 (EP);
A61K36/05 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | A61K36/05, A01N43/16, A01N65/03, A01P1/00, A23K10/16, A23L33/105, A23L33/12, A61K31/7032, A61K35/68, A61K35/748, A61K36/02, A61P31/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | ANTI-NOROVIRUS-MITTEL | [2021/23] | English: | ANTI-NOROVIRUS AGENT | [2021/23] | French: | AGENT CONTRE LE NOROVIRUS | [2021/23] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2021 | Translation filed | 05.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 20.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2014146098 (AURORA ALGAE INC [US]); | [XY]EP2934505 (QUALITAS HEALTH LTD [IL]); | [XY]JP6114484B ; | International search | [YA]JP2015015918 (DENSO CORP, et al); | [XYA]JP2016065037 (NIKKEN SOHONSHA CORP); | [XA]WO2017149858 (EUGLENA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XA]JP2017160180 (EUGLENA CO LTD, et al); | by applicant | JPS6139813B | JP2009292736 | JP2013047196 | JP2015015918 | WO2015190116 | JP2018143050 |