EP3830291 - SPECIFIC DETECTION OF DEOXYRIBONUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES USING NOVEL CRISPR ENZYME-MEDIATED DETECTION STRATEGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokitae LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE Bellevue, Washington 98005-4046 / US | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUGHMAN, Ted A. 21120 NE 78th St Redmond, Washington 98053 / US | 02 /
MADAN, Damian 250 SE Bush St. Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | 03 /
NALEFSKI, Eric 797 High School Rd NW Bainbridge Island, Washington 98110 / US | 04 /
LE NY, Anne-Laure M. 4708 193rd Pl SE Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19844572.8 | 26.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019US43734 | Priority number, date | US201816049460 | 30.07.2018 Original published format: US201816049460 | [2021/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020028185 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3830291 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6825, C12Q1/66, C12N15/113, C12Q1/6834 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825 (KR);
C12Q1/6832 (US);
C12N15/11 (US);
C12Q1/66 (KR);
C12Q1/6834 (EP);
C12N2310/20 (US);
C12N2800/80 (US);
C12Q2521/327 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6834, C12Q2521/301, C12Q2563/103, C12Q2563/149 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | C12Q1/6825, C12Q1/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SPEZIFISCHER NACHWEIS VON DESOXYRIBONUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NEUARTIGEN CRISPR-ENZYM-VERMITTELTEN NACHWEISSTRATEGIEN | [2021/23] | English: | SPECIFIC DETECTION OF DEOXYRIBONUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES USING NOVEL CRISPR ENZYME-MEDIATED DETECTION STRATEGIES | [2021/23] | French: | DÉTECTION SPÉCIFIQUE DE SÉQUENCES D'ACIDE DÉSOXYRIBONUCLÉIQUE FAISANT APPEL À DE NOUVELLES STRATÉGIES DE DÉTECTION À MÉDIATION PAR UNE ENZYME CRISPR | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 22.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007128589 (SANDERS MITCHELL C [US], et al); | [Y]US2014220589 (SANDERS MITCHELL C [US], et al); | [Y]US2014227773 (BABU UMA MAHESH [US], et al); | [Y]EP3325651 (SENSE BIODETECTION LTD [GB]); | [XY]WO2018107129 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [T]WO2020028180 (TOKITAE LLC [US], et al); | [T]WO2020167597 (TOKITAE LLC [US]) | International search | [A]US2017204407 (GILBERT LUKE A [US], et al) [A] 1-35* See the whole document. *; | [X] - GOOTENBERG, J. S. et al., "Multiplexed and portable nucleic acid detection platform with Casl3, Casl2a, and Csm6", Science, (20180427), vol. 360, doi:10.1126/science.aaq0179, pages 439 - 444, XP055664590 [X] 1-35 * See abstract; internal pages 1, 3-5; figures 1-4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aaq0179 | [X] - GOOTENBERG, J. S. et al., "Nucleic acid detection with CRISPR-Casl3a/C2c2", Science, (20170428), vol. 356, doi:10.1126/science.aam9321, pages 438 - 442, XP055481345 [X] 1-35 * See abstract; internal pages 1-3; figures 1-2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aam9321 | [X] - CHEN, J. S. et al., "CRISPR-Cas12a target binding unleashes indiscriminate single-stranded DNase activity", Science, (20180427), vol. 360, doi:10.1126/science.aar6245, pages 436 - 439, XP055615609 [X] 1-35 * See abstract; internal pages 1-3; figures 1-4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aar6245 | [A] - MURUGAN, K. et al., "The Revolution Continues: Newly Discovered Systems Expand the CRISPR-Cas Toolkit", Mol. Cell, (20171005), vol. 68, doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2017.09.007, pages 15 - 25, XP085207633 [A] 1-35 * See abstract; pages 19, 21-22; table 1; figures 1-3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2017.09.007 |