EP3832330 - ESTIMATION SYSTEM, ESTIMATION DEVICE, ESTIMATION METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA Masayuki c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
ENDO Hirotaka c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/23] | Feller, Frank Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19844719.5 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/23] | WO2019JP30035 | Priority number, date | JP20180143635 | 31.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018143635 | [2021/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020027203 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3832330 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H02J7/00, G01R31/367 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G01R31/367 (EP,US);
G01R31/392 (EP,US);
H01M10/425 (EP);
H01M10/4285 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (EP);
H01M10/46 (US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (US);
B60L50/60 (US);
B62J43/13 (US);
B62J43/16 (US);
G01R31/387 (EP);
G01R31/389 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP);
H01M2010/4278 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | G01R31/392, H01M10/42, H01M10/48, H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/23] | Title | German: | SCHÄTZSYSTEM, SCHÄTZVORRICHTUNG, SCHÄTZVERFAHREN UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/23] | English: | ESTIMATION SYSTEM, ESTIMATION DEVICE, ESTIMATION METHOD, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/23] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ESTIMATION, DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION, PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2021/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2021 | Translation filed | 01.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/23] | 11.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0902521 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6,7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0022] *; | [X]EP2980596 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,8-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0041] - [0073] - [0095] *; | [XY]US2018203070 (PARK JEONGHYUN [KR]) [X] 1,2,9-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0011] - [0016] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0076] - [0081] - [0089] * * paragraphs [0129] - [0130] * [Y] 6,7 | International search | [A]JPH0850167 (NIPPON SOKEN) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [A]JPH09243716 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [Y]JPH11150809 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * , *; | [A]JP2001057711 (ZIP CHARGE KK) [A] 1-13 * , & US 2003/0209375 A1 & GB 2353151 A *; | [A]JP2003249271 (AKUSON DATA MACHINE KK) [A] 1-13; | [Y]JP2004333472 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al) [Y] 1-13 * , *; | [Y]JP2006226789 (DENSO CORP, et al) [Y] 1-13 * , *; | [A]CN103091642 (UNIV BEIJING JIAOTONG) [A] 1-13 * , *; | [A]WO2015198631 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * , & US 2017/0294689 A1 & EP 3163669 A1 & KR 10-2017-0016956 A & JP 6370902 B2 *; | [Y]US2018203070 (PARK JEONGHYUN [KR]) [Y] 1-13 * , [0046] ~ [0119], 1 - 8 & EP 3351953 A1 & KR 10-2018-0085165 A & CN 108336427 A *; | [PA]JP2019066216 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [PA] 1-13 * , *; | [PA]JP2019122254 (GOGORO INC) [PA] 1-13 * , *; | [EA]JP2019168453 (GS YUASA CORP) [EA] * , * | by applicant | JP2001257008 | JP2017009540 | JP2018143635 | JP2019068552 |