EP3800737 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING ANTENNA ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry Foundation 77, Cheongam-ro, Nam-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37673 / KR | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yeonwoo 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Wonbin A-702, 57, Hyoryeong-ro 72-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06732 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sehyun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Junho 502, 36, Hyoja-ro 118beon-gil, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37663 / KR | 05 /
YUN, Sumin 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/14] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19845170.0 | 31.07.2019 | [2021/14] | WO2019KR09528 | Priority number, date | KR20180089974 | 01.08.2018 Original published format: KR 20180089974 | [2021/14] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020027568 | Date: | 06.02.2020 | Language: | KO | [2020/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800737 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.02.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/22, H01Q21/29, H01Q21/00, H01Q25/00, H01Q9/04, H01Q3/30, H01Q21/08 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H01Q25/005 (EP);
H01Q21/00 (KR);
H01Q3/36 (KR,US);
H01Q1/2283 (EP);
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/38 (KR);
H01Q1/46 (KR);
H01Q1/48 (KR);
H01Q21/0025 (EP);
H01Q21/08 (EP);
H01Q21/293 (EP);
H01Q3/30 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/14] | H01Q21/00, H01Q9/04, H01Q1/38, H01Q1/48, H01Q1/46, H01Q3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/14] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT MIT GRUPPENANTENNE | [2021/14] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING ANTENNA ARRAY | [2021/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPORTANT UN RÉSEAU D'ANTENNES | [2021/14] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2021 | Translation filed | 04.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/14] | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016064816 (PRERADOVIC STEVAN [AU], et al); | [X]US2017302306 (OUYANG YUEHUI [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR101212354B ; | [A]US2015070228 (GU XIAOXIONG [US], et al); | [Y]KR20170077787 (APPLE INC [US]); | [Y]KR20170135980 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [Y]KR101874077B |